judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JENKINS (RONALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33598
Short Caption:JENKINS (RONALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CR9804019Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/12/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00210
01/15/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. (district court minutes) Due Date: 10 days
01/19/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from Todd J. Dressel, Deputy Attorney General. The Attorney General's Office is handing this matter, not the White Pine County District Attorney. 99-00362
01/19/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Enlarge Time in Which to File Appellant's Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 99-00378
01/21/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: September 1 and 2, 1998. Court Reporter: Tonja D. Lemich. 99-00403
01/27/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00579
02/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall forthwith file the transcript request form provisionally submitted with the motion. Court reporter Tonya Lemich shall, within 30 days, file and serve a full transcript. 99-01015
02/12/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings dated: September 1, 2, 1998; December 7, 1998. 99-00375
03/18/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. September 1 and 2, 1998 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Tonya D. Lemich. 99-01958
05/12/1999MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: June 11, 1999. 99-03881
06/03/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Criminal Appeal. 99-04618
08/11/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We grant appellant's motion and " . . . order this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-07439
08/11/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.