judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GARRY TRAUTMAN and PATRICIA TRAUTMAN, husband and wife v. HOWARD E. KILLEBREW and PRINCESS R. KILLEBREW, husband and wife

Case Heading (S-11-0177)
Case Number:S-11-0177Case Docketed On:08/02/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Water (Title 41)
Short Title:GARRY TRAUTMAN and PATRICIA TRAUTMAN, husband and wife v. HOWARD E. KILLEBREW and PRINCESS R. KILLEBREW, husband and wife
Full Title:GARRY TRAUTMAN and PATRICIA TRAUTMAN, husband and wife, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. HOWARD E. KILLEBREW and PRINCESS R. KILLEBREW, husband and wife, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGarry TrautmanPhilip A. Nicholas
AppellantPatricia TrautmanPhilip A. Nicholas
AppelleeHoward E. KillebrewKatherine Lamere Mead
Kathleen Joanne Swanson
AppelleePrincess R. KillebrewKatherine Lamere Mead
Kathleen Joanne Swanson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/02/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/02/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
08/02/2011Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
08/02/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/04/2011Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
09/13/2011Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
09/14/2011Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant requesting original copyEventPhone CallFinal
09/23/2011Event - Phone Call to counsel to Appellant again requesting original copy of motion.EventPhone CallFinal
09/26/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Dismiss Appeal Pursuant to Rule 18 W.R.A.P.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/26/2011Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
09/26/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal