judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: JAMES G. CHARLES

Case Information: 11-BG-0305
Short Caption:IN RE: JAMES G. CHARLESClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN16-11Filed Date:03/10/2011

Opening Event Date:03/10/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
William R. RossNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentJames G. Charles NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/10/2011DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the Court of Appeals of Maryland disbarring respondent by consent.
03/10/2011RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a letter to respondent advising respondent of Bar Counsel's recommendation to the court to issue an order suspending respondent on an interim basis pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), and of his obligation to file a compliant affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14.
04/01/2011ORDER Having received a certified copy of an order of the Court of Appeals of Maryland disbarring respondent by consent from the practice of law, it is, accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (d), ORDERED that respondent is suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending final disposition of this proceeding, effective on the date of entry of this order, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why he should not be disbarred from the practice of law in the District of Columbia. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall reply to respondent's response no later than fifteen days after service of the response. Alternatively, no later than fifteen days after respondent's response was due, Bar Counsel may object to the imposition of reciprocal discipline based upon the factors set forth in D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (c). Bar Counsel shall provide the court with the relevant portions of the record of the proceeding in the other disciplining court, the statute and rules that governed it, and a short statement identifying all of the issues that the matter present. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Bar Counsel opposes the imposition of identical discipline, Bar Counsel shall (1) recommend appropriate non-identical discipline or (2) request that the matter be referred to the Board for its recommendation as to discipline. Respondent may reply within ten days after service of Bar Counsel's submission. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirement of Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Rule XI, Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to compliance with Rule XI, Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. (ETW)
05/16/2011STATEMENT from the Office of Bar Counsel regarding reciprocal discipline
05/19/2011TMC - notice of reciprocal discipline - OTSC - statement of bar counsel - proposed order
05/23/2011LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the US Court of Appeal for the District of Columbia, reciprocally disparring respondent
06/23/2011FiledDISBARMENT ORDERED that James G. Charles, Esquire is hereby disbarred from the practice of law in the District of Columbia. It is FURTHER ORDERED that for purposes of reinstatement respondent's suspension will not begin to run until such time as he files an affidavit that fully complies with the requirements of D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). (BR,NE,KG)
07/07/2011RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a notice of nonfiling by respondent the required affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14.