judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOLLINGSWORTH (DANNY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36443
Short Caption:HOLLINGSWORTH (DANNY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C91396Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/18/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12280
08/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36415, 36428, 36441, 36443, 36474, 36475. Document No. 00-13570.
12/18/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 8. 00-22038
12/18/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn2 [We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML. 01-20916
01/08/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00232
01/08/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/25/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2002. 02-00232