judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CAPITOL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC V. CAPITOL BEHAVIORAL HEALTH,LLC

Case Information: 11-CV-0328
Short Caption:CAPITOL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC V. CAPITOL BEHAVIORAL HEALTH,LLCClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB9040-10Filed Date:03/10/2011

Opening Event Date:03/10/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/31/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/14/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/05/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCapitol Medical Center LLc.N
Kenneth H. RosenauYN
AppelleeCapital Behavioral Health LLc.N
S. Scott MorrisonYN
Michael J. Klyce, Jr.NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/10/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/21/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 10, 2011, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC)
03/25/2011RECORD INDEX
03/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/30/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
05/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 60 days (no oppo)
05/16/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION - to motion to enlarge time to file aplt's brief
05/24/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY- to aple's oppo to aplt's unconsented motion to enlarge time tofile aplt's brief
06/02/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and the appendix, the opposition and reply thereto, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed with this court on or before July 8, 2011. (ETW) elp
07/08/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 9/30/11. no oppo
07/13/2011FiledOpposition to aplt's motion for a second extension of time to file brief (Appellee)
07/22/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 9/30/11.
07/22/2011FiledReply to Appellee's Opposition to Appellant's Uncontested Motion to Enlarge Time to File Brief. (Appellant)
09/30/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/30/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/31/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/31/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/21/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
04/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
05/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/04/2012FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)
05/15/2012FiledOrder Denying aplt's motion for oral argument.
05/16/2012LodgedOpposition to appellant's motion for argument (Appellee)
06/14/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges King, Easterly, Beckwith
08/28/2012FiledStipulation To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant Capitol Medical Center LLc., Appellee Capital Behavioral Health LLc.)
09/13/2012FiledDismissed with prejudice
10/05/2012FiledMandate