Case Information: 11-BG-1176 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: JEFFREY A. NEMEROFSKY, BAR REGISTRATION NO. 476841 | Classification: | Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | BDN436-09 | Filed Date: | 09/21/2011 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/21/2011 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Petitioner | Bar Counsel |
| ||||||||||
Petitioner | Board of Professional Responsibility |
| ||||||||||
Respondent | Jeffrey A. Nemerofsky | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
09/21/2011 | Filed | Notice of Discipline under Rule XI s. 11 - Certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of California accepting the disciplinary resignation of respondent. | ||
09/21/2011 | Lodged | Letter From Bar Counsel to respondent advising respondent of Bar Counsel's recommendation that the court reciprocally suspend respondent and of his obligation to file an affidavit. (Petitioner Bar Counsel) | ||
10/11/2011 | Filed | Order - ORDERED that respondent is suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending final disposition of this proceeding, effective on the date of entry of this order, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why he should not be suspended for five years from the practice of law in the District of Columbia with his reinstatement conditioned upon a showing of his fitness to resume the practice of law.... (ETW) | ||
10/21/2011 | Filed | Affidavit (Goldberg) (Respondent) | ||
10/21/2011 | Filed | Affidavit D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). (Respondent) | ||
10/25/2011 | Filed | Affidavits (D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g) and Goldberg) (Respondent) | ||
11/10/2011 | Filed | Response To Order To Show Cause (Respondent) | ||
11/21/2011 | Filed | Statement regarding regarding reciprocal discipline. (Petitioner Bar Counsel) | ||
12/16/2011 | Filed | TMC//TMC//NOTICE OF RECIPROCAL DISCIPLINE//OTSC//STATEMENT OF RESPONDENT//STATEMENT OF BAR COUNSEL//PROPOSED ORDER//MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE APPEALS 08BG1256 & 11BG1108 | ||
01/12/2012 | Filed | Suspended -ORDERED that Jeffrey A. Nemerofsky, is hereby suspended for a period of five years with the imposition of a fitness requirement, nunc pro tunc to November 25, 2009. (TH,RZ,FE) |