judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHNSON (BILLY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36442
Short Caption:JOHNSON (BILLY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C144493Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/30/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-12279
08/02/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. (Not typewritten). 00-13335
08/22/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-14740
08/25/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The motion filed August 22, 2000, is granted. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement. 00-14948
09/05/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-15596
11/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, file and serve either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant. 00-19513
11/15/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 10 days.
11/15/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Corrected brief due: 10 days.
11/17/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-20260
11/28/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 11/27/00. 00-20736
11/28/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-20737
12/20/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 25, 2000. Court Reporter: Tina B. Smith. 00-22139
12/21/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-22220
07/30/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/02/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered each of appellant's contentions and concluded that they lack merit, we 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn17[Appellant also requests that this court "vacate the sentence and remand . . . with instructions that a different district judge specifically enforce the plea bargain, but with a proviso that during the time of [his] incarceration he be treated and educated for his disorders." We decline to grant the relief he seeks.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-00082
01/29/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00594
01/29/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/13/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 1, 2002. 02-00594