judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICKY D. MILLER and CHRISTOPHER L. GONZALEZ v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, TOM FORSLUND, Director, TOM JOHNSON, Chemical Testing Supervisor, JAMES L. MOORE, Laboratory Supervisor

Case Heading (S-11-0197)
Case Number:S-11-0197Case Docketed On:08/26/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:RICKY D. MILLER and CHRISTOPHER L. GONZALEZ v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, TOM FORSLUND, Director, TOM JOHNSON, Chemical Testing Supervisor, JAMES L. MOORE, Laboratory Supervisor
Full Title:RICKY D. MILLER and CHRISTOPHER L. GONZALEZ, Appellants (Petitioners), v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH, TOM FORSLUND, Director, TOM JOHNSON, Chemical Testing Supervisor, JAMES L. MOORE, Laboratory Supervisor, Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRicky D. MillerCole N. Sherard
AppellantChristopher L. GonzalezCole N. Sherard
AppelleeDepartment of HealthGregory A. Phillips
Robin Sessions Cooley
AppelleeTom ForslundGregory A. Phillips
Robin Sessions Cooley
AppelleeTom JohnsonGregory A. Phillips
Robin Sessions Cooley
AppelleeJames M. MooreGregory A. Phillips
Robin Sessions Cooley

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure
Opinion Number:2012 WY 65
Citation:275 P.3d 1257

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/26/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/26/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/26/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/26/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/31/2011Motion - Stay briefing - opposedMotionStay briefing - opposedFinal
09/02/2011Event - Hardcopy received - motion to stay briefing schedule.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/12/2011Response/Objection - Other - motion to stay briefing.Response/ObjectionOtherFinal
09/12/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' response in opposition to motion to stay briefing schedule; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/20/2011Order - Denying Motion for StayOrderDenyFinal
10/13/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
10/17/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants Ricky D. Miller and Christopher L. Gonzalez, Statement of Cost of Original Transcript and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/29/2011Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
11/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellees; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/01/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/20/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/28/2011Record - Other - Letter from District Court Clerk re designation of entire record. Action began in agency, directed her to go ahead and send the entire District Court pleading file.RecordOtherFinal
12/30/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/30/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/09/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/25/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/25/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/25/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/01/2012Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal