judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLENE P. BELTON V. ARTHUR BELTON

Case Information: 11-CV-0327
Short Caption:CHARLENE P. BELTON V. ARTHUR BELTONClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB4125-08Filed Date:03/09/2011

Opening Event Date:03/09/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/23/2012
Argued/Submitted:05/17/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/18/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharlene P. Belton N
John W. DavisYY
AppelleeArthur Belton N
James E. McCollumYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/09/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/21/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 9, 2011, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
03/25/2011RECORD INDEX
03/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/30/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
04/05/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) aple (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 2/2/11) (elp)
04/21/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (49-pgs/tape 2/2/11 proc.)w/cd
05/11/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 30, 2011, directing appellant to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days, and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of the order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
05/11/2011FiledAPPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
05/31/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to July 5, 2011 (titled as: aplt's motion to alter briefing schedule, nunc pro tunc)
06/07/2011FiledAPPELLEE'S OPPOSITION- to aplt's moiton to alter briefing schedule, nunc pro tunc and supplemental motion to dismiss appeal
06/15/2011 On consideration of appellees' motion to dismiss and appellant's motion to alter briefing schedule, nunc pro tunc, the opposition and supplemental moiton to dismiss appeal, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before July 5, 2011. Failure to comply with this order may result in the granting of appellee's motion to dismiss appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's motion and supplemental motion to dismiss are hereby held in abeyance pending further order of this court. (ETW) elp
07/05/2011FiledAPPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 10 days - to 7/18/11, elp
07/13/2011FiledOpposition (Appellee) to aplt's motion for extension of time nunc pro tunc & renewed supplemental motion to dismiss appeal
09/01/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 10 days - to 7/18/11, and HOLDINGS APPELLEE'S MOTION AND RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL IN ABEYANCE.
09/19/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (renewed) (Appellee)Granted
09/26/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for six working days (Appellant) "AND" Opposition to Motion to Dismiss AppealDenied Without Prejudice
10/03/2011FiledOpposition to aplt's motion for an additonal time nunc pro tunc and renewed supplemental motion to dismiss appeal (Appellee)
10/21/2011FiledOrder Granting Appellee's Motion, Supplemental Motion and Renewed Motion to Dismiss Appeal
10/21/2011FiledDismissed
10/21/2011FiledOrder Denying Without Prejudice
11/10/2011FiledMotion To Reinstate Appeal (Appellant)Granted
11/18/2011FiledMotion For Costs And/Or Attorney Fees (Appellee)Denied Without Prejudice
11/23/2011FiledOpposition to aplt's motion to reinstate appeal (Appellee)
12/08/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Reinstate Appeal
12/08/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
12/08/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
12/08/2011FiledOrder Denying Motion For Costs And/Or Attorney Fees (Appellee)
12/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
01/05/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
01/23/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
01/23/2012FiledBriefing Completed
02/15/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
03/29/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/17/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Fisher, Easterly,Schwelb
08/23/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Easterly, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.)
09/18/2012FiledMandate