judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MALIK RAY DRISKELL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0313
Short Caption:MALIK RAY DRISKELL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-5783-10Filed Date:03/08/2011

Opening Event Date:03/08/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/14/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMalik Ray Driskell Y
Regina V. WagnerNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/08/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/28/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Regina Michaels, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
03/28/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Regina Michael, Esquire
04/21/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
04/21/2011RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript.
05/03/2011RECEIVED pro se letter from Appellant stating that he did not request an appeal or for appointment of counsel.
08/30/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (46 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 10/6/11 proc.
08/30/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (103 pgs/Graybill) 10/7/11 proc.
08/30/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (113 pgs/Armstrong) 10/12/11 proc.
08/30/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (114-123 pgs/Armstrong) 10/13/11 proc. w/cd
09/14/2011FiledRecord Index
09/14/2011FiledRecord Copies
09/14/2011FiledRecord Completed
10/03/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
11/23/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 2/17/12.
12/29/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant)
01/10/2012FiledOrder Granting Appellant's motion to dismiss appeal
01/10/2012FiledDismissed