judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BJ HOUGH, LLC, LEO L. GARCIA, MARY D. GARCIA, FRANCIS SHIVE, RAWLEY D. MARRS, DONELLA L. MARRS. NORMAN PRING, MARY JANE PRING, KATHLEEN SHEEHAN, KENNETH J. RACINE, RENA J. RACINE v. CITY OF CHEYENNE, a Wyoming municipal corporation and SWAN RANCH, LLC

Case Heading (S-11-0180)
Case Number:S-11-0180Case Docketed On:08/04/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Cities and Towns (Title 15)
Short Title:BJ HOUGH, LLC, LEO L. GARCIA, MARY D. GARCIA, FRANCIS SHIVE, RAWLEY D. MARRS, DONELLA L. MARRS. NORMAN PRING, MARY JANE PRING, KATHLEEN SHEEHAN, KENNETH J. RACINE, RENA J. RACINE v. CITY OF CHEYENNE, a Wyoming municipal corporation and SWAN RANCH, LLC
Full Title:BJ HOUGH, LLC, LEO L. GARCIA, MARY D. GARCIA, FRANCIS SHIVE, RAWLEY D. MARRS, DONELLA L. MARRS. NORMAN PRING, MARY JANE PRING, KATHLEEN SHEEHAN, KENNETH J. RACINE, RENA J. RACINE, Appellants, (Petitioners), v. CITY OF CHEYENNE, a Wyoming municipal corporation and SWAN RANCH, LLC, Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBJ HOUGH, LLCGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
AppellantLeo L. GarciaGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
AppellantMary D. GarciaGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
AppellantFrancis ShiveGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
AppellantRawley D. MarrsGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
AppellantDonella L. MarrsGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
AppellantNorman PringGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
AppellantMary Jane PringGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
AppellantKathleen SheehanGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
AppellantKenneth J. RacineGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
AppellantRena J. RacineGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
AppelleeCity of Cheyenne, Wyoming, a Municipal CorporationDaniel E. White
AppelleeSwan Ranch, LLCThomas N. Long
Natalie Kay Winegar

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Planning and Zoning
Opinion Number:2012 WY 140
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/04/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/04/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/04/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/08/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/08/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Continue Due Date for Appellants' BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/08/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/09/2011Event - Phone Call to Counsel for Appellant re due date of brief.EventPhone CallFinal
10/20/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/21/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellants B.J. Hough et al.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/24/2011Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
10/24/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' statement of costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/16/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/16/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time for Appellee City of Cheyenne to file its brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/17/2011Order - Grant - extension of time - City of CheyenneOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/17/2011Event - Phone Call - Called counsel for Swan Ranch as a courtesy to let them know an extension order has been filed in this case. Counsel was notified upon docketing of case that court orders are served electronically and to become e-filing users as soon as possible.EventPhone CallFinal
12/09/2011Brief - Failure to file - appellee - Swan Ranch, LLCBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
01/09/2012Brief - Appellee (attachment on paper copies only).BriefAppelleeFinal
01/09/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee City of Cheyenne (Swan Ranch attorneys listed on brief, but not party to brief)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/10/2012Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by Appellee City of CheyenneNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
01/30/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/08/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/05/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/12/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Gay Woodhouse obo AppellantsNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/14/2012Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - Motion for withdrawal of counsel (Teri J. Cassidy); and received proposed order.MotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
03/14/2012Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel (Teri J. Cassidy is allowed to withdraw)OrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
03/16/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Daniel White obo Appellee CityNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/27/2012Order - Oral argument - amending schedule, rescheduled for April 18, 2012OrderOral argument - amending scheduleFinal
03/27/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/18/2012Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Gay Woodhouse for Appellants; Daniel White and John Ridge, argument by Mr. White for Appellee City of Cheyenne) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/18/2012Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/01/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/19/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/19/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/19/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/19/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/26/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 11/20/2012ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal