judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-2820
B-2820
06/24/1971
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF CORPUS CHRISTI, ET AL.
HOWARD F. SUDDUTH
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/07/1972Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/13/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
11/02/1971Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
09/30/1971Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/22/1971Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/24/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/07/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/26/1972Opinion issued
01/13/1972Response to Petition
12/14/1971Motion to re-set submission date filed.
11/09/1971Motion to re-set submission date filed.Filing granted
11/02/1971Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/06/1971Document received (See Remarks)
09/30/1971Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/22/1971Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/24/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/24/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CITY OF HOUSTON, TEXASAmicus Curiae
William Andress, Jr.Amicus Curiae
Howard F. SudduthRespondent
City of Corpus Christi, et al.Petitioner
Texas City Attorneys AssociationAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information