judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DRODIO REAL ESTATE, INC. V. ROBERT C. CORELESS

Case Information: 11-AA-0312
Short Caption:DRODIO REAL ESTATE, INC. V. ROBERT C. CORELESSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES242-11Filed Date:03/15/2011

Opening Event Date:03/15/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerDrodio Real Estate Inc.N
RespondentRobert C. Coreless NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/15/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/15/2011FILING FEE of $100.00 paid
03/16/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAG, OAH, Robert C. Coreless and Michael Milwee
03/23/2011 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that Drodio Real Estate, Inc. is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that petitioner shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (A)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. (JAC)
04/14/2011PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for extension of time to file a response to order dated 3/23/11 (seeking counsel)
05/10/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to identify counsel is granted to the extent that petitioner shall identify its counsel within 10 calendar days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
06/03/2011ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
06/03/2011DISMISSED
06/03/2011RECEIVED - courtesy copy of ltr sent to petitioner regarding preparation of the record and transcripts (filed by OAH)