judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

VISION 2007, LLC v. LEXSTAR DEVELOPMENT AND CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC

Case Heading (S-10-0020)
Case Number:S-10-0020Case Docketed On:01/21/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Liens (Title 29)
Short Title:VISION 2007, LLC v. LEXSTAR DEVELOPMENT AND CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC
Full Title:VISION 2007, LLC, Appellant (Petitioner), v. LEXSTAR DEVELOPMENT AND CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantVision 2007. LLCStephen H. Kline
John W. Burke
AppelleeLexstar Development and Construction Company, LLCRyan Justin Schwartz

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Liens
Opinion Number:2011 WY 84
Citation:255 P.3d 914

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/21/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/21/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/21/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/05/2010Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Douglas Fowler for AppellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
03/09/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Stephen H. Kline on behalf of appellant.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
03/18/2010Motion - Admission pro hac vice - John W. Burke for Appellant; and received proposed order.MotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
03/19/2010Order - Pro hac vice - allowOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
03/24/2010Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - John W. Burke on behalf of AppellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
04/16/2010Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
04/23/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/26/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdrawEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/29/2010Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel - Douglas Fowler is withdrawn as counsel for appellant.OrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
05/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/07/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Ryan Schwartz for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by AppellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
05/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John Burke for apellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/17/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/24/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Stephen Kline for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/17/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (John W. Burke and Stephen H. Kline, argument by Mr. Burke for appellant; Ryan Justin Schwartz for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/17/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/25/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/10/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/10/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal