judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LESSIE D. GRAVES V. UNICCO SERVICE COMPANY

Case Information: 11-AA-0341
Short Caption:LESSIE D. GRAVES V. UNICCO SERVICE COMPANYClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES2964-10Filed Date:03/17/2011

Opening Event Date:03/17/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/19/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/23/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerLessie D. Graves N
Rani RolstonNY
RespondentUnicco Service CompanyN
S. Libby HenningerNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/17/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/17/2011FILING FEE of $100.00 paid
03/17/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAG, OAH, Michael Milwee and respondent
03/29/2011 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that Unicco Service Company is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 9D.C. 2001); D.C. APP. R. 15 (A)(5). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
04/21/2011APPEARANCE - of S. Libby Henninger counsel for the respondent (Unicco)
08/19/2011FiledRecord On Appeal
08/19/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/25/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/13/2011FiledOrder directing petitioner's brief and appendix, accompanied by a motion w/in 20 days.
11/10/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Petitioner)Granted
11/29/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Petitioner)
11/29/2011FiledDismissed
12/23/2011FiledMandate