judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JUAN A. HERRERA V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.

Case Information: 11-AA-0339
Short Caption:JUAN A. HERRERA V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB050-10Filed Date:03/15/2011

Opening Event Date:03/15/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/06/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/09/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/14/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/30/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerJuan A. Herrera N
Michael J. KitzmanYY
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY
Donna M. MuraskyNY
Michael A. MilweeYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/15/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/15/2011FILING FEE OF $100.00 PAID
03/16/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD & OAG
05/06/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/hearing of 8/24/09
05/06/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/16/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
06/22/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
06/22/2011APPENDIX
07/26/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
07/28/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) on or before 9/27/11.
09/26/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until October 14, 2011 (Respondent)
10/13/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent)Granted
10/27/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Respondent) 11/10/11
11/09/2011FiledBrief (Respondent)
11/09/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/05/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/14/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Oberly, Pryor
04/06/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Oberly, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge)
04/30/2012FiledMandate