judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. KOPP (TIMOTHY)

Case Information: 36457
Short Caption:STATE VS. KOPP (TIMOTHY)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C165338Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Pretrial
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:01/15/2002 at 8:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:01/15/2002How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/19/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/19/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-12498
08/03/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 3/16/00, 4/5/00, 4/26/00. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. 00-13497
08/22/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-14704
08/22/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-14702
09/11/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion Seeking One of Three Alternative Remedies through which John C. Wawerna will be Allowed to Withdraw as Attorney for Timothy Jack Kopp, and the Public Defender will be Instructed to Represent Mr. Kopp, Entirely. 00-15949
09/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On September 11, 2000, counsel for respondent filed a motion seeking to withdraw as counsel for respondent. Counsl may not withdraw until he has filed a fast track rresponse. The motion to withdraw is therefore denied. Counsel for respondent shall file and serve the fast track response within 20 days of this order or show cause why counsel for respondent should not be sanctioned. 00-16990
10/16/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-18303
10/16/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-18305
10/24/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief due: 40 days. fn1[If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party shall file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief. fn2[We hereby suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript in this appeal.] The answering brief and reply brie shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 00-18812
11/03/2000MotionFiled Motion. Renewed Motion Seeking One of Three Alternative Remedies through which John C. Wawerna will be Allowed to Withdraw as Attorney for Timothy Jack Kopp, and the Public Defender will be Instructed to Represent Mr. Kopp, Entirely. 00-19345
12/05/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-21210
12/05/2000AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Amended Appendix. 00-21211
12/11/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Suspend the Briefing Schedule Pending a Decision on the Renewed Motion of John C. Wawerna to Withdraw as Counsel for Timothy Jack Kopp. 00-21592
01/09/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 01/05/01. 01-00433
01/09/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent's Amended Appendix. 01-00434
02/08/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-02540
04/18/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On November 3, 2000, counsel for respondent, attorney John C. Wawerna, filed a motion to withdraw as attorney of record for respondent. All required briefs having been filed in this appeal, we deny respondent's motion to suspend the briefing schedule as moot. We grant attorney Wawerna's motion to withdraw as counsel of record for respondent. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing new counsel for respondent. If respondent is indigent, the district court shall have 30 days within which to appoint counsel for respondent. fn1[Attorney Wawerna has informed this court that the Clark County Public Defender has been appointed to represent respondent in the continued proceedings below. The district court may want to consider whether the Clark County Public Defender should also be appointed to represent respondent in this appeal.] Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, respondent must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from the appointment or appearance of counsel in the district court, the district court clerk shall: (1) transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order; and (2) serve a copy of this order of remand on respondent's new counsel. Within 20 days from appointment or appearance in the district court, counsel shall have 10 days within which to file a notice of appearance with the clerk of this court. In the event new counsel determines that the filing of a supplemental answering brief is warranted, the brief shall be filed within 40 days from the filing of the notice of appearance with the clerk of this court. If new counsel fails to file a supplemental answering brief within this time frame, briefing shall be deemed completed in this appeal. 01-06644
05/21/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Clark County Public Defender. 01-08383
06/11/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appointment of Counsel. Certified copy of notice from Clark County Clerk filed in district court on May 14, 2001, enclosing a copy of minute order. Clark County Public Defender appointed as counsel for respondent. 01-09658
12/04/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on January 15, 2002, at 8:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. (SNP02M-WM/DA/ML)
01/02/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
01/15/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02M-WM/DA/ML
04/05/2002Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Maupin, C.J., Agosti and Leavitt, JJ. By the Court, Agosti, J. I concur: Leavitt, J. Maupin, C.J., dissenting. 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 22. SNP02M. 02-06057
04/30/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-06517
04/30/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/10/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 3, 2002. 02-06517