judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CONSUMER ACTION NETWORK V. DANIELLE V. LEWIS

Case Information: 11-AA-0351
Short Caption:CONSUMER ACTION NETWORK V. DANIELLE V. LEWISClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES03047-10Filed Date:03/22/2011

Opening Event Date:03/22/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/21/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/07/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/11/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/18/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerConsumer Action NetworkN
Connie N. Bertram NN
Eric A. Reicher NN
Guy BrennerNN
Robert Scott PetersmeyerYN
RespondentDanielle V. Lewis N
John C. KeeneyYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/21/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
03/22/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/22/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Michael A. Milwee, Esq.
03/29/2011 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
06/13/2011RECEIVED - courtesy copy of ltr from OAH to petitioner regarding preparation and cost of transcript and if payment is not received, the record will be certified on 6/28/11 without the transcripits. ta
07/21/2011FiledRecord On Appeal
07/21/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/28/2011FiledBriefing Order
08/09/2011FiledAppearance by - John C. Keeney, Jr. as counsel for the respondent (Danielle Lewis)
09/06/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
09/06/2011FiledAppendix (Attached to Brief) (Petitioner)
10/07/2011FiledBrief (Respondent)
10/07/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/24/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
10/31/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner)Granted
11/17/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Petitioner)
11/17/2011FiledReply Brief (Petitioner)
12/05/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/05/2012FiledAppearance of Guy Brenner on behalf of (Petitioner)
03/19/2012FiledMotion To Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott Petersmeyer (Petitioner)
03/23/2012FiledOrder Granting petitioner Robert Scott Petersmeyer, Esq. to appear pro hac vice.
03/27/2012FiledLetter From appellant's attorney letting court know that pro hac vice attorney Scott Petersmeyer will argue case (Petitioner)
04/11/2012FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Oberly, Pryor Scott Petersmeyer, Esq. for petitioner John C. Keeney, Esq. for respondent
04/26/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Oberly, Associate Judges, and pryor, Senior Judge.)
05/18/2012FiledMandate