judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEIGHBORS VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 29589
Short Caption:NEIGHBORS VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR4256Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/29/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/25/1996Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/25/1996Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
01/10/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. The district court shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, either (1) enter a written order or (2) inform this court that is is reconsidering its order. In the event the district court enters a written order, the clerk of the district court shall, within 120 days from the date the district court enters a written order, transmit to this court the entire record of the proceedings in the district court. The record shall include any transcripts already prepared.
01/24/1997Order/IncomingReceived District Court Order. Certified copy of district court order: Steven L. Sexton, Esq. Appointed to represent Appellant. Filed 1/22/97. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant.)
01/30/1997Order/IncomingReceived District Court Order. Certified copy of district court order: Order Appointing Counsel to Represent Indigent Appellant.
02/03/1997Order/IncomingReceived District Court Order. Order Denying Petition for writ of Habeas corpus (Post-conviction) filed in district court on 1/31/97.
04/10/1997MotionFiled Motion. Motion for leave to file late Docketing Statement.
04/10/1997Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement.
04/14/1997Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Motion filed April 10, 1997. The docketing statement provisionally submitted on April 10, 1997, shall be filed, forthwith.
04/14/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
06/03/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Because Appellant is now represented by counsel, we vacate that portion of our order filed January 10, 1997, directing the clerk of the district court to transmit the entire record of the proceedings in the district court. Appellant shall serve and file the Opening Brief and Appendix within 120 days from the date of counsel's first appearance in this court on April 10, 1997. Briefing shall then proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
08/13/1997BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered.
08/13/1997AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Appellant's Appendix.
09/15/1997MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Respondent shall have to and including October 15, 1997, to file the Answering Brief.
10/15/1997MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Strike Portions of Appellant's Opening Brief and Request to Stay Respondent's Answering Brief Pending Decision on Motion to Strike.
10/29/1997MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. To answer Respondent's Motion to Strike Portions of Appellant's Opening Brief and Request to Stay Respondent's Answering Brief pending decision on Motion to Strike.
11/04/1997Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Motion filed October 29, 1997. The answer to Respondent's Motion to Strike portions of Appellant's Opening Brief shall be served and filed within 10 days of the date of this order.
11/17/1997Other Other. Filed Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of Appellant's Opening Brief.
04/13/1998Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Steven Sexton requesting status on Motion to Strike.
04/23/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We defer ruling on Respondent's Motion to Strike Appellant's Opening Brief at this time. This court will consider Respondent's arguments in this Motion to Strike and Appellant's objections thereto when this matter is fully reviewed. We deny Respondent's Motion to Strike Appellant's entire Appendix. We deny Respondent's Motion to Stay briefing pending resolution of this motion as moot. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the Answering Brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
05/28/1998BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: 5/26/98).
05/28/1998AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondent's Appendix.
06/29/1998BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: Hand delivered 6/29/98).
06/29/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/17/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contentions and concluded that they are without merit, " . . . we affirm the order of the district court denying appellant's post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus." fn3[Respondent's motion to strike portions of appellant's opening brief is denied as moot.] SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-00994
02/13/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-01082
02/13/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 14, 2001. 01-01082