judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AARON JOHNSON V. SO OTHERS MIGHT EAT INCORPORATED

Case Information: 11-AA-0352
Short Caption:AARON JOHNSON V. SO OTHERS MIGHT EAT INCORPORATEDClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES00152-11Filed Date:03/21/2011

Opening Event Date:03/21/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/27/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/06/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/19/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/22/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAaron Johnson Y
J. Kearney ShanahanNN
Eric J. HarterYN
RespondentSo Others Might Eat IncorporatedN
Mitchell A. Mosvick YN
Neal D. Mollen NN
Claire DeasonNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/21/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
03/21/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
03/30/2011ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to March 21, 2011. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
03/30/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO OAH & MILWEE
04/07/2011APPEARANCE - of Neal D. Mollen and Mitchell A. Mosvick counsels for the respondent (So Others Might Eat Inc.)
07/22/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/transcripts & exhibts
07/27/2011FiledRecord Completed
07/28/2011FiledBriefing Order
08/05/2011FiledAppearance by J. Kearney Shanahan as Pro Bono Counsel for Appellant. (Petitioner)
08/16/2011FiledAppearance by Eric J. Harter, Esq. as Pro Bono Counsel for appellant (Petitioner)
09/06/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
09/06/2011FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
10/06/2011FiledBrief (Respondent)
10/06/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/06/2011FiledAppearance by Claire Deason as counsel for(Respondent).
10/07/2011FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority and substitute page iii (Table of Authorities) for the brief. (Respondent)
10/24/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
10/27/2011FiledReply Brief (Petitioner)
12/05/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/20/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Respondent)
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/19/2012FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, Belson
09/27/2012FiledReversed And Remanded (OPINION) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the decision on review is reversed and remanded to the Office of Administrative Hearings with instructions to enter an order granting petitioner unemployment compensation benefits.)
10/22/2012FiledMandate