judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LABORI (LUIS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 29551
Short Caption:LABORI (LUIS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 29815 , 39279 , 41207 , 42591 , 43905 , 48587
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C133562Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/04/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/18/1996Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/18/1996Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant.)
12/10/1996Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
12/10/1996Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. District Court Minutes. Due Date: 10 days
12/13/1996Notice of Appeal DocumentsReceived Documents from District Court Clerk. Copy of District Court Minutes.
01/10/1997TranscriptFiled Transcript. Recorder's Transcripts dated: 2/22/96; 4/4/96; 4/10/96; 6/20/96; 6/24/96 through 6/28/96; 6/25/96; 6/26/96; 6/27/96; 8/23/96; 11/12/96 and 12/3/96. Court Reporter: Janice R. Liston.
03/27/1997Other Other. Returned, unfiled, case appeal statement. (Must be filed and certified in the district court clerk's office.)
03/27/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsReceived Documents from District Court Clerk. Copy of District Court Minutes.
04/14/1997Other Other. Received a certified copy of the Case Appeal Statement. Filed in the district court on March 31, 1997.
04/29/1997MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion to file Opening Brief.
05/20/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We order Appellant to file the docketing statement within 10 days of the date of this order and to file the opening brief within 30 days of the date of this order. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Future failures to abide by our procedural rules may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant.)
05/23/1997MotionFiled Motion. Motion to consolidate, Motion to Strike Arguments B-F from Appellant Fonseca's Opening Brief, and Motion to Hold Briefing Schedules in Abeyance. (Nos. 29551 and 29815).
06/02/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
06/04/1997Other Other. Filed Opposition to Motion to Strike and Hold Briefing Schedule in Abeyance. (Nos. 29551 and 29815).
06/20/1997BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 6/19/97.)
07/10/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We deny Respondent's Motion to consolidate these appeals (Nos. 29551 and 29815). We deny Respondent's Motion to strike certain agruments in Appellant Fonseca's Opening Brief without prejudice to Respondent's right to respond to the arguments in its Answering Brief. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file an Answering Brief in Docket No. 29551 and an Answering Brief in Docket No. 29815. (Nos. 29551 and 29815).
08/12/1997BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: no postmark - express mail.)
09/12/1997BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: Fed-Ex 9/11/97).
02/04/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral Argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein.
02/04/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/31/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, serve and file an Appendix. Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against counsel for Appellant. fn1[It does not appear that Appellant ever complied with the provisions of NRAP 9(a). Because the transcripts were filed in this court on January 10, 1997, we waive the requirement that Appellant comply with NRAP 9(a).
04/16/1999MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Leave to file Supplemental Brief/Supplemental Brief. (Original and 3 copies - 1 copy returned.)
04/19/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix.
10/05/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. fn1[Appellant has submitted a proper person motion for leave to file a supplemental brief. Contrary to appellant's contentions, he does not have an affirmative constitutional right to appellate self-representation. We therefore deny appellant's proper person motion for leave to file a supplemental brief.] Having considered appellant's claims and concluded that they lack merit or are not appropriate for review on direct appeal, " . . . we affirm the judgment of the district court." SNP00A-CY/WM/NB 00-17638
10/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17724
10/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. 00-17724
12/28/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Original and one copy of the Motion Expediting Criminal Appeal.