judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PETER B. KIBBEE v. FIRST INTERSTATE BANK, SHERIDAN, WYOMING, as Trustee of the CHANDLER H. KIBBEE TRUST AGREEMENT dated May 26, 1987, and the MERCEDES K. KIBBEE TRUST AGREEMENT dated May 26, 1987, as amended March 15, 1996, and any subsequent amendments thereto, the SHARON K. LOBO CHARITABLE REMAINDER ANNUITY TRUST dated September 10, 2006, the JOSHUA KIBBEE LOBO CHARITABLE LEAD UNITRUST dated November 2, 2006, the AURORA LOBO CHARITABLE LEAD UNITRUST dated November 2, 2006, the PETER B. KIBBEE CHARITABLE REMAINDER ANNUITY TRUST dated November 2, 2006, and as Co-Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF MERCEDES K. KIBBEE, DECEASED; ROBERT FERRIL, Trustee of the CHANDLER H. KIBBEE TRUST AGREEMENT dated May 26, 1987, and the MERCEDES K. KIBBEE TRUST AGREEMENT dated May 26, 1987, as amended March 15, 1996, and any subsequent amendments thereto; CHANDLER H. KIBBEE AND MERCEDES K. KIBBEE FOUNDATION FOR CHILDREN; SHERIDAN COUNTY YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION; SHARON K. DELOBO, individually, and as Co-Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF MERCEDES K. KIBBEE, DECEASED; AURORA LOBO; JOSHUA KIBBEE LOBO; LAURA GALLOWAY; DARRYL KURTZ, SR.; DARRYL KURTZ, JR.; SCOTT STEWART; NADEEN IOTT; HAROLD JOHNSON; and MARY SENE

Case Heading (S-10-0022)
Case Number:S-10-0022Case Docketed On:01/27/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Trusts (Title 4)
Short Title:PETER B. KIBBEE v. FIRST INTERSTATE BANK, SHERIDAN, WYOMING, as Trustee of the CHANDLER H. KIBBEE TRUST AGREEMENT dated May 26, 1987, and the MERCEDES K. KIBBEE TRUST AGREEMENT dated May 26, 1987, as amended March 15, 1996, and any subsequent amendments thereto, the SHARON K. LOBO CHARITABLE REMAINDER ANNUITY TRUST dated September 10, 2006, the JOSHUA KIBBEE LOBO CHARITABLE LEAD UNITRUST dated November 2, 2006, the AURORA LOBO CHARITABLE LEAD UNITRUST dated November 2, 2006, the PETER B. KIBBEE CHARITABLE REMAINDER ANNUITY TRUST dated November 2, 2006, and as Co-Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF MERCEDES K. KIBBEE, DECEASED; ROBERT FERRIL, Trustee of the CHANDLER H. KIBBEE TRUST AGREEMENT dated May 26, 1987, and the MERCEDES K. KIBBEE TRUST AGREEMENT dated May 26, 1987, as amended March 15, 1996, and any subsequent amendments thereto; CHANDLER H. KIBBEE AND MERCEDES K. KIBBEE FOUNDATION FOR CHILDREN; SHERIDAN COUNTY YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION; SHARON K. DELOBO, individually, and as Co-Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF MERCEDES K. KIBBEE, DECEASED; AURORA LOBO; JOSHUA KIBBEE LOBO; LAURA GALLOWAY; DARRYL KURTZ, SR.; DARRYL KURTZ, JR.; SCOTT STEWART; NADEEN IOTT; HAROLD JOHNSON; and MARY SENE
Full Title:PETER B. KIBBEE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. FIRST INTERSTATE BANK, SHERIDAN, WYOMING, as Trustee of the CHANDLER H. KIBBEE TRUST AGREEMENT dated May 26, 1987, and the MERCEDES K. KIBBEE TRUST AGREEMENT dated May 26, 1987, as amended March 15, 1996, and any subsequent amendments thereto, the SHARON K. LOBO CHARITABLE REMAINDER ANNUITY TRUST dated September 10, 2006, the JOSHUA KIBBEE LOBO CHARITABLE LEAD UNITRUST dated November 2, 2006, the AURORA LOBO CHARITABLE LEAD UNITRUST dated November 2, 2006, the PETER B. KIBBEE CHARITABLE REMAINDER ANNUITY TRUST dated November 2, 2006, and as Co-Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF MERCEDES K. KIBBEE, DECEASED; ROBERT FERRIL, Trustee of the CHANDLER H. KIBBEE TRUST AGREEMENT dated May 26, 1987, and the MERCEDES K. KIBBEE TRUST AGREEMENT dated May 26, 1987, as amended March 15, 1996, and any subsequent amendments thereto; CHANDLER H. KIBBEE AND MERCEDES K. KIBBEE FOUNDATION FOR CHILDREN; SHERIDAN COUNTY YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION; SHARON K. DELOBO, individually, and as Co-Personal Representative of the ESTATE OF MERCEDES K. KIBBEE, DECEASED; AURORA LOBO; JOSHUA KIBBEE LOBO; LAURA GALLOWAY; DARRYL KURTZ, SR.; DARRYL KURTZ, JR.; SCOTT STEWART; NADEEN IOTT; HAROLD JOHNSON; and MARY SENE; Appellees (Defendants)

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPeter B. KibbeePatrick J. Crank
Greg L. Goddard
Christopher Michael Wages
AppelleeFirst Interstate BankTom C. Toner
AppelleeRobert FerrilTom C. Toner
AppelleeChandler H. Kibbee and Mercedes K. Kibbee Foundation for ChildrenDennis M. Kirven
AppelleeSheridan County Young Men's Christian AssociationDennis M. Kirven
Timothy J. Kirven
AppelleeSharon K. DeLoboKim D. Cannon
Sasha M. Johnston
AppelleeAurora LoboThomas M. Hogan
AppelleeJoshua Kibbee LoboThomas M. Hogan
AppelleeLaura GallowayDennis M. Kirven
AppelleeDarryl Kurtz Sr.Dennis M. Kirven
AppelleeDarryl Kurtz Jr.Dennis M. Kirven
AppelleeScott StewartDennis M. Kirven
AppelleeNadeen IottDennis M. Kirven
AppelleeHarold JohnsonDennis M. Kirven
AppelleeMary SeneDennis M. Kirven

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Estates - Probate, Estates - Wills
Opinion Number:2010 WY 143
Citation:242 P.3d 973

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/27/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/27/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/27/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/27/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/29/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
03/12/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
04/15/2010Brief - Appellee - Statement of position in lieu of brief of appellees Lobos.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/16/2010Brief - Appellee First Interstate Bank.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee First Interstate BankEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Statement of Position of Appellees, Aurora Lobo and Joshua Kibbee Lobo, In Lieu of Appellee BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/27/2010Brief - Appellee Sharon DeLoboBriefAppelleeFinal
04/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Sharon DeLobo; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/28/2010Brief - Appellee (Counsel unable to e-file brief 04/27/2010 due to system problem, hard copies reflect that date on certificate of service)BriefAppelleeFinal
04/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees Chandler H. Kibbee and Mercedes K. Kibbee Foundation for Children, Inc.; Sheridan County Young Men's Christian Association; Laura Galloway; Darryl Kurtz Jr.; Scott Stewart; Nadeen Iott; Harold Johnson; and Mary Sene.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/30/2010Brief - Failure to file - appellee, Robert Ferril, TrusteeBriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
05/03/2010Motion - Other - to take judicial notice or supplement the record.MotionOtherFinal
05/03/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion to take judicial notice of complaint filed July 2, 2009 by Sharon De Lobo and/or supplement the record with complaint filed July 2, 2009 by Sharon De LoboEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/04/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's reply briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/07/2010Response/Objection - Motion (First Interstate Bank)Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/10/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee First Interstate Bank's Response to Appellant's Motion to Take Judicial Notice of Complaint Filed on July 2, 2009 by Sharon De Lobo and/or Supplement the Record with Complaint Filed July 2, 2009 by Sharon De LoboEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/10/2010Response/Objection - Other - Motion for Judicial Notice (Kibbee Foundation, et al.)Response/ObjectionOtherFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tom C. Toner for appellee First Interstate Bank.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick J. Crank for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/11/2010Response/Objection - Motion (Sharon De Lobo)Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/11/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, thirteen volumes. Volumes I-XII, Original Papers; Volume XIII, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's YMCA Response and Objection to Judicial Notice and Object to Supplementing the RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/12/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/12/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's reply to Brief of Sharon De LoboEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/13/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Objection to Appellant's Motion to Take Judicial Notice of Complaint Filed on July 2, 2009, by Sharon De Lobo and/or Supplement the Record with Complaint Filed July 2, 2009 by Sharon De LoboEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/13/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/13/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's reply to brief of appellee YMCA.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting Thomas Hogan for appellees Aurora and Joshua Lobo.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kim Cannon for appellee Sharon DeLobo.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/18/2010Response/Objection - Motion. Response to appellee's objection to motion to take judicial notice.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's joint reply to appellee's responses to appellant's motion to take judicial notice of complaint filed on July 2, 2009, by Sharon De Lobo and/or supplement the record with complaint filed July 2, 2009 by Sharon De Lobo.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - from Dennis Kirven indicating that Timothy Kirven will present argument for appellee YMCA.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
05/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - notice of additional authority.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/25/2010Order - Denying Motion to Take Judicial Notice and Order Denying Motion to Supplement the RecordOrderDenyFinal
06/15/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Patrick J. Crank, Greg L. Goddard and Christopher Michael Wages, argument by Mr. Crank for appellant; Kim D. Cannon, Thomas M. Hogan, Timothy Kirven and Tom C. Toner, argument by Messrs. Cannon, Kirven and Toner for appellees) and taken under advisement. Mr. Hogan aligned with appellant.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/15/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/05/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/23/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/23/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/23/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/29/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cards - record signed for 11/24/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal