judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MEYER GROUP, LTD V. STEUART INVESTMENT COMPANY

Case Information: 11-CV-0346
Short Caption:MEYER GROUP, LTD V. STEUART INVESTMENT COMPANYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 11-CV-0020 Consolidated:11-CV-0346
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB8449-08Filed Date:03/14/2011

Opening Event Date:03/14/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:04/12/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/22/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/07/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/01/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Appellant-Cross-AppelleeSteuart Investment CompanyN
T. Michael GuiffreNY
Appellee-Cross-AppellantMeyer Group LtdN
Michael K. RossNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/14/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/05/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal in these matters, and this court's briefing order of March 17, 2011, issued in appeal no. 11-CV-20, and it appearing that no new transcript is needed for appeal no. 11-CV-346, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that this court's order of March 17, 2011, is hereby vacated. It is FURTHER ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 11-CV-20 and 11-CV-346 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Superior Court shall transmit the record index for 11-CV-346 forthwith. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the briefs shall be filed as follows: Opening brief (not to exceed 50 pages) of appellant/cross-appellee, and the appendix within 40 days from the date of this order; Responsive brief (not to exceed 50 pages) of appellee/cross-appelant, including opening brief of cross-appeal, within 30 days from the date of service of the opening brief of appellant/cross- appellee; Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of appellant/cross-appellee, including response to the cross-appeal brief, within 21 days from the date of service of the responsive brief of appellee/cross-appellant; and Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of appellee/cross-appellant, if any, within 21 days from the date of service of the reply brief of appellant/cross-appellee. (ETW) elp
04/12/2011RECORD INDEX 11cv346
04/12/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/16/2011APLT-X-APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 5/23/11
05/23/2011RECEIVED - Appellant/Cross-Appellee Brief and Appendix Vols 1 thru 3
06/02/2011 On consideration of appellant/cross- appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and the appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged brief of appellant/cross-appellee and the appendixes Volumes 1-3. It is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged brief of appellant/cross-appellee and appendixes Volume 1-3 are filed. It is (MORE)
06/02/2011APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/02/2011APPENDIX - (Volumes 1-3)
06/02/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee/ cross appellant shall be filed on or before June 27, 2011. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
06/27/2011APPELLEE/CROSS-APPELLANT'S BRIEF
07/22/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
07/22/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
08/17/2011FiledReply Brief cross aplt (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
09/14/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
11/16/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/07/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Oberly, Beckwith, Reid
03/07/2013FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Oberly and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Reid, Senior Judge.)
04/01/2013FiledMandate