judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

JACK H. GRIEDER v. ROBERT GRIEDER, ET AL.

Case: B-2785
B-2785
06/09/1971
Application for Writ of Error
JACK H. GRIEDER
ROBERT GRIEDER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/18/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/01/1971Reply to ResponsePetitioner
10/18/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/24/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
06/09/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/18/1971Motion for Rehearing
11/01/1971Reply to Response
10/27/1971Response to Motion filed
10/18/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/24/1971Response to Petition
06/09/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/09/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jack H. GriederPetitioner
Robert Grieder, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information