judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES E. PEARSON v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-10-0021)
Case Number:S-10-0021Case Docketed On:01/25/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:JAMES E. PEARSON v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:JAMES E. PEARSON, Appellant (Claimant/Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Objector/Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJames Edward Pearson Pro Se
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/25/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/25/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/26/2010Brief - Appellant (Certificate of service indicates that brief was served on 02/21/2010, but envelopes bear a postmark of 02/24/2010)BriefAppellantFinal
02/26/2010Correspondence - Outgoing to Appellant requesting additional copy of brief and service of brief on the Wyoming Attorney General. Also returned Designation of Record for filing in the Trial CourtCorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
03/04/2010Brief - Other - Copy of Brief of Petitioner requested by CourtBriefOtherFinal
03/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Copy of Notice of Substitution of Counsel file in trial courtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
04/07/2010Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
04/07/2010Motion - Stay - otherMotionStay - otherFinal
04/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Motion for Abeyance of Briefing Schedule and Appellee's Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support ThereofEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/07/2010Order - Stay briefingOrderStay briefingFinal
04/22/2010Motion - Extension of time - file response/objectionMotionExtension of time - file response/objectionFinal
04/22/2010Order - Denying Appellant's Request for Extension of Time to File Reply to Respondent's Motion for Abeyance and/or Stay of AbeyanceOrderDenyFinal
04/27/2010Order - Denying Motion to Dismiss Appeal (and setting briefing)OrderDenyFinal
05/17/2010Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
05/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's motion to dismiss appeal and remand case and memorandum of points and authorities in support thereof; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/24/2010Response/Objection - Motion - Petitioner's traverse in opposition to appellee's motion to dismiss appeal and remand case and memorandum of points and authorities in support thereof.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/25/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/25/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/27/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/01/2010Motion - Other - Petitioner's Motion for Respondent to Show Cause to Not Be Found in Default on Appeal, Petition for Respondent to be Found in Default on Appeal and Petitioner's Request for SettingMotionOtherFinal
06/08/2010Order - Dismiss - involuntary, Order Vacating District Court Order of Dismissal and Order of Remand to the Office of Administrative HearingsOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
06/24/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal