judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERTA WEST V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCS

Case Information: 11-AA-0342
Short Caption:ROBERTA WEST V. DC DEPT OF EMPLOYMENT SVCSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB097-99Filed Date:03/17/2011

Opening Event Date:03/17/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/20/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Intervenor-RespondentWashington Hospital CenterN
William P. Dale NN
PetitionerRoberta West N
Richard W. Galiher, Jr.NN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/17/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/17/2011FILING FEE of $100.00 paid
03/17/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAG and Michael Milwee
03/29/2011 ORDERED that PETITIONER SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this PFR should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER... (BY: ETW)
03/29/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
04/18/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- to court order
05/02/2011INTERVENOR'S REPLY to Petitioner's response to court's Order to Show Cause. *****CONSTRUED AS MOTION - SEE 5/18/11 ORDER LW
05/18/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION of Washington Hospital center FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE and LEAVE to file the lodged reponse IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the response. It is ****MORE*****
05/18/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the PFR IS DISMISSED for having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER... (FITEST)
05/18/2011DISMISSED
06/20/2011MANDATE ISSUED