judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN C. CHEEKS V. ALLSTATE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Information: 11-CV-0347
Short Caption:JOHN C. CHEEKS V. ALLSTATE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB8973-10Filed Date:03/15/2011

Opening Event Date:03/15/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/02/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn C. Cheeks YPro SeN
AppelleeAllstate Life Insurance CompanyN
Rhett E. Petcher NN
AppelleeValdivieso Insurance & Financial Services Inc.N
Rhett E. Petcher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/15/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/29/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed either for having been IMPROPERLY FILED since appealable order has not been identified; or as having been PREMATURELY FILED since the motion to alter or amend remains pending. (BY: ETW)
03/29/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC - appellant's MISC motion
04/18/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE dated March 26, 2011
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to request subpoena for payer or payer's information from Appellee Allstate Life Insurance Company and Valdivieso Insurance and Financial Services on Life Insurance Policy
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to immediately cancel and void insurance policies
05/02/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION - to Motion to Immediately Cancel and Void Insurance Policies and to Motion to Immediately request a subpoena for payer or payer's information from Appellee . . .
05/05/2011 ORDERED that THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED AS PREMATURELY FILED but w/o prejudice to appellant fiing a new appeal once all matters have been resolved... It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's MOTIONS ARE DENIED AS MOOT. (THKNTE)
05/05/2011DISMISSED
06/02/2011MANDATE ISSUED
07/25/2011FiledMotion To Reinstate Appeal (Appellant)
07/27/2011FiledTMC-MOTION TO REINSTATE
07/28/2011FiledOrder Denying MOTION TO REINSTATE