judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JACK DOLLARHIDE v. SCOTT BANCROFT, MURRAY SHATTUCK, and MICHAEL JOHNSON

Case Heading (S-10-0023)
Case Number:S-10-0023Case Docketed On:01/28/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:JACK DOLLARHIDE v. SCOTT BANCROFT, MURRAY SHATTUCK, and MICHAEL JOHNSON
Full Title:JACK DOLLARHIDE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. SCOTT BANCROFT, MURRAY SHATTUCK, and MICHAEL JOHNSON, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJack DollarhideWeston W. Reeves
Anna M. Reeves Olson
AppelleeScott BancroftJohn A. Sundahl
AppelleeMurray ShattuckRichard Alan Mincer
AppelleeMichael JohnsonL. Kathleen Chaney

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Fraud, Other, Trial, Trial - Pretrial Proceedings
Opinion Number:2010 WY 126
Citation:239 P.3d 1168

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/28/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/28/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/28/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/15/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/29/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
04/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Appellant's Amended Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
05/03/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John Sundahl for appellee Bancroft.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Anna Reeves Olson for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/19/2010Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
05/19/2010Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
05/19/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to vacate oral argument and reschedule; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/21/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant and Appellant's Supplemental Designation of The Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/01/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/01/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, nine volumes. Volumes I-IV, Original Papers; Volume V, Exhibits & Transcripts; Volume VI, Transcripts; Volumes VII-IX, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/01/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/23/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Richard Mincer for appellee Shattuck.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Anna Olson for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John Sundahl for appellee Bancroft.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - L. Kathleen Chaney for appellee Johnson.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/17/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Anna M. Reeves Olson and Weston W. Reeves for appellant; L. Kathleen Chaney, Richard Alan Mincer and John A. Sundahl for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/17/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
09/14/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/30/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/30/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/30/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/30/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/06/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cards - Record signed for 10/4/10ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal