judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WICKER (MATTHEW) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 36468
Short Caption:WICKER (MATTHEW) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR5100Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/21/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/21/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-12666
08/29/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: September 6, 2000. 00-15179
09/06/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-15676
09/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order. 00-16243
09/27/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-17044
09/27/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-17046
10/11/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-18010
10/11/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-18011
10/30/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contentions and concluded that they lack merit, " . . . we affirm the district court's order dismissing appellant's post-conviction petition for a writ of habeas corpus." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-19031
11/28/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-19418
11/28/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 30, 2000. 00-19418
06/25/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney. 02-10971