judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ESTATE OF SARAH ELLEN HENNEGHAN; GERALD HENNEGHAN, APLT

Case Information: 11-PR-0360
Short Caption:IN RE: ESTATE OF SARAH ELLEN HENNEGHAN; GERALD HENNEGHAN, APLTClassification:Appeals - Probate - Probate
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:ADM623-10Filed Date:03/11/2011

Opening Event Date:03/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/27/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/23/2011
Argued/Submitted:04/12/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/06/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGerald HenneghanYPro SeN
AppelleeDonna R. Washington N
Gloria JohnsonYN
AppelleeGodfrey HenneghanNPro SeN
AppelleeStephen E. HenneghanNPro SeN
AppelleeAli A. CoatesNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/29/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOWCAUSE why this appeal should not be LIMITED TO THE FEBRUARY 22, 2011 ORDER ADMITTING THE WILL TO PROBATE... (BY: ETW)
03/29/2011FiledTMC - OTSC - ROTSC-JUNE 13, 2011 ORDER
04/18/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
07/12/2011FiledORDER DISCHARGING THE OTSC - LIMITING THE APPEAL and Initial Order
07/12/2011FiledNo Transcript Needed
07/27/2011FiledRecord Index
07/27/2011FiledRecord Copies
07/27/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/01/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/09/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/09/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/18/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte directing appellees to submit their briefs, accompanied by a motion for leave within 15 days
11/02/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellee Washington)Granted
11/09/2011FiledReceived ORDER dated 10/18/11, mailed to appellee Godfrey Henneghan to the latest address of record at 1021 6th Street NW Washington, DC 20002, and returned by the U.S. Postal Office as "undeliverable" and forwarded to files this date. elp (Appellee Henneghan)
11/30/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee Washington)Denied
12/23/2011FiledOrder Denying Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee Washington) and directing appellant to follow the rules of this court regardless of his pro se status.
12/23/2011FiledOrdered that the Clerk shall file the lodged brief of appellee Donna washington.
12/23/2011FiledBrief (Appellee Washington)
12/23/2011FiledBriefing Completed
12/28/2011FiledMotion - to purge the Probate Court's pirates from his property; for a stay of the Probate Court's order admitting the purported will to probate; to set aside the Probate Court's orders appointing Donna Renee Washington personal representative, the Probate Court's order appointing Gloria Johnson as Counsel and the order appointing a special adminstration; and return of aplt's property (filed as Emergency) (Appellant)Denied
12/30/2011FiledTMC//MOTION FOR STAY AND TO SET ASIDE COURT ORDERS
01/17/2012FiledORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO THE EXTENT THAT IT REQUESTS A STAY and TO THE EXTENT THAT IT REQUESTS FURTHER RELIEF...
01/23/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/09/2012FiledSupplemental Record #1 Judge Campbell's 1/26/12 order
03/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
04/10/2012FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee Washington)Denied
04/12/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Blackburne-Rigsby, Ferren, Washington
04/20/2012FiledOpposition to appellee motion to dismiss appeal (Appellant)
06/04/2012FiledOrder Denying aple's motion to dismiss appeal.
06/14/2012FiledReversed And Remanded (Opinion) (AMENDED ON 6/21/12) (Washington, Chief Judge, Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judge, and Ferren, Senior Judge.) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the February 22, 2011 order is reversed and remanded to the probate court for proceedings consistent with this opinion.)
07/06/2012FiledMandate