Case: 05-00-00228-CV
05-00-00228-CV
02/11/2000
Summary Judgment
Wilson/Barnes General Contractors, Inc.
Striland Construction, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/15/2015 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
01/10/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |||
01/10/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |||
10/13/2000 | Record Retention | Destroy | | ||
10/13/2000 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | | ||
10/13/2000 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | | ||
10/12/2000 | Submission | | |||
10/12/2000 | Submitted | | |||
09/29/2000 | Response due | | |||
09/19/2000 | Letter Sent by the Court | | |||
04/26/2000 | Notice to appellant that brief is late | | |||
04/11/2000 | Brief Due | | |||
03/12/2000 | Brief Due | | |||
03/08/2000 | Letter Filed | | |||
03/01/2000 | ADR Referral Order Issued | | |||
02/15/2000 | 125.00 Filing Fee Due | | |||
02/15/2000 | Docketing Statement Notice | | |||
02/11/2000 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |||
02/11/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
02/11/2000 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
01/08/2000 | Record due | | |||
12/08/1999 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |||
11/09/1999 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/10/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
01/13/2016 | Case Stored | Clerk record or reporter record returned to district/county clerk; case destroyed |
10/12/2006 | Status | Destroy record |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Julia Pendery | Mediator | Julia F. Pendery |
Striland Contruction, Inc. | Appellee | Trice Ragon Richey |
Wilson/barnes General Contract | Appellant | Charles F. Holmans, Iii |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Carlos G. Lopez
CC-99-1949-B