judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TORMAN VEGAS, INC. VS. STRATO-RETAIL, LLC

Case Information: 36446
Short Caption:TORMAN VEGAS, INC. VS. STRATO-RETAIL, LLCCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A371934Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/21/2000 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from John Peter Lee-check no. 28792.
07/17/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12292
07/21/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/18/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Nancy Allf of Allf & Associates in place and stead of John Peter Lee, Ltd., as counsel for appellant. 00-14538
08/29/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter. M. Nelson Segel.
09/05/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing of Substitution of Attorneys. 00-15573
09/07/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-15748
09/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant has 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 00-16382
10/11/2000MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 00-18002
10/24/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NNP/CLK 00-18765
10/24/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.