judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARVIN KENNETH SHUE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0201)
Case Number:S-11-0201Case Docketed On:09/02/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:MARVIN KENNETH SHUE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MARVIN KENNETH SHUE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMarvin Kenneth Shue Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law
Opinion Number:2012 WY 73
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/02/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/02/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/03/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/04/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/04/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/26/2011Event - Phone Call to Elisabeth Trefonas re Entry of Appearance and request that it be efiledEventPhone CallFinal
11/02/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - Tina Olson for appellant. Per phone call, the Public Defender's office is withdrawing.MotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
11/03/2011Event - Phone Call to Ms. Trefonas re Entry of Appearance, will get it efiled.EventPhone CallFinal
11/04/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Withdraw (Public Defender's Office)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/15/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Elisabeth Trefonas, Assistant Public Defender for appellant.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
11/15/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance by Elisabeth M. W. Trefonas on behalf of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/15/2011Order - Other - Allowing Withdrawal of CounselOrderOtherFinal
11/17/2011Event - Hardcopy received - entry of appearance of Elisabeth Trefonas dated November 15, 2011.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/28/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Second Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/29/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/17/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/18/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Third Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/18/2012Order - Grant - third extension of time, no further consideredOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
03/05/2012Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
03/05/2012Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
03/05/2012Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/07/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 US 738 (1967)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/07/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file Pro Se brief; and received proposed orderEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/07/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Withdraw as Counsel; and received proposed orderEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/08/2012Record - Received unfiled record from Elisabeth Trefonas; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.RecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
03/27/2012Order - Allowing court appointed counsel to withdraw, conditionally affirming judgment and sentenceOrderAllowing court appointed counsel to withdrawFinal
03/27/2012Record - Returned unfiled record to district court clerk per their request.RecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
03/29/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Unfiled record signed for 3/28/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
05/14/2012Brief - Failure to file - appellant (Anders)BriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
05/24/2012Opinion - Published Order Affirming the Judgment and Sentence of the District CourtOpinionPublished orderFinal
06/11/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/11/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter (unfiled record was returned in March)Notice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/11/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal