judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ESTATE OF ALBERTHA DUNCOMBE DIGGS; PEGGY ENGRAM, APLT

Case Information: 11-PR-0331
Short Caption:IN RE: ESTATE OF ALBERTHA DUNCOMBE DIGGS; PEGGY ENGRAM, APLTClassification:Appeals - Probate - Probate
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:ADM223-04Filed Date:03/07/2011

Opening Event Date:03/07/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/11/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPeggy Engram N
Johnny M. HowardNY
AppellantEstate of Albertha Duncombe DiggsN
Johnny M. HowardNY
AppelleeJorge Penate N
Alysia Robben NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/07/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/18/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 7, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellants' shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellants must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellants must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellants' failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
04/18/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 18, 2011, directing appellant to file the statement regarding transcript, within 20 days, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
04/18/2011DISMISSED
05/11/2011MANDATE ISSUED