judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BARFIELD VS. MAESTAS

Case Information: 36463
Short Caption:BARFIELD VS. MAESTASCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CF9905006Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/20/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/20/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12586
07/27/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-RR/WM/MS 00-13067
07/31/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing respondent: Deputy Attorney General S. Scott Greenberg. 00-13252
08/08/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Pursuant to NRAP 40(d), returned, with letter, Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration.
08/15/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Robert T. Barfield. Returned, unfiled the Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration received on 8/14/00. (Per NRAP 40(f), the court returned, unfiled, the unrequested answer).
09/21/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing Respondent: Deputy Attorney General David C. Creekman. 00-16728
09/22/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. " . . . we deny the petition for rehearing." fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper perosn documents received from appellant.] SNP99B-RR/WM/MS 00-16750
10/10/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-16998
10/10/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 23, 2000. 00-16998