Case: 08-90-00158-CR
08-90-00158-CR
04/12/1990
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Alvarado, Eduardo
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/13/1991 | Shuck purged | | |
09/13/1991 | Decision from Supreme Court or CCA | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/08/1991 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
03/29/1991 | Petition for Discretionary Review | | |
03/18/1991 | Fee paid | | |
03/11/1991 | Fee paid | | |
02/27/1991 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
02/27/1991 | Payment of fee due requested | | |
02/27/1991 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
02/22/1991 | Submitted | | |
02/22/1991 | Submission | | |
02/22/1991 | Submitted | | |
12/20/1990 | Submission | | |
12/03/1990 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
11/21/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
11/07/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
11/07/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/07/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/31/1990 | Brief Filed | | |
10/31/1990 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/17/1990 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
10/16/1990 | Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry | | |
09/28/1990 | Sup. St. of Facts Filed | | |
09/26/1990 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/19/1990 | Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion | | |
09/14/1990 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
08/29/1990 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/29/1990 | Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
08/29/1990 | Order entered | | |
08/21/1990 | Amended Motion Filed to Correct Original Motion | | |
08/15/1990 | Miscellaneous Motion Filed | | |
08/15/1990 | Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed | | |
07/16/1990 | Exhibits Filed | | |
07/16/1990 | Statement of Facts Filed | | |
06/06/1990 | Motion for Extension Statement of Facts Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
05/21/1990 | Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed | | |
05/16/1990 | Transcript Filed | | |
04/12/1990 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
04/12/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/13/1991 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Bruce J. Ponder |
Unknown | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Steve W. Simmons |
Trial Court Information
65th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Edward Marquez
55799-65
40 yrs. run c/c w/55854-65