judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. WASHINGTON (BARUCH)

Case Information: 36456
Short Caption:STATE VS. WASHINGTON (BARUCH)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C154955Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Pretrial
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/19/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/19/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 00-12496
07/19/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: May 30, 2000, June 2, 2000 and June 8, 2000. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. Filed in district court on: July 14, 2000. 00-12497
07/31/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 30, 2000, June 2, 2000 and June 8, 2000. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 00-13218
08/23/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 00-14813
08/23/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 00-14814
09/14/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: September 19, 2000. 00-16222
09/20/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-16582
09/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On September 20, 2000, counsel for respondent filed a motion for an extension of time to file the fast track response. He requests an extension of 30 days. The motion is denied. Counsel for respondent shall file and serve the fast track response within 20 days of this order or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. 00-16980
10/17/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 2/18/00 (Schorn); 3/1/00 (D'Amato); and 4/11/00 (Shorn). Court Reporters: Maureen Schorn and Joseph D'Amato. Filed in district court on: October 10, 2000. 00-18380
10/17/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-18402
10/20/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/18/00 and 4/11/00. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. 00-18614
10/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Counsel for respondent shall file and serve the fast track response in this appeal within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for respondent should not be sanctioned. 00-18876
12/10/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-21566
03/15/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. "ORDER the district court's order granting respondent's motion to dismiss VACATED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-04596
04/05/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-05823
05/17/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-08227
06/04/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08406
06/04/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/21/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 6, 2001. 01-08406