judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DON GRONBERG, SUE GRONBERG, JIM FARMER, WES FOX, RENELDA FOX, CHRISTY FOX, JENNY FOX, DENNIS CICHELLI, SUE CICHELLI, DEBORAH FOX, DON LANDIS, BEVERLY LANDIS, SCOTT AUSTIN, HOLLY AUSTIN, ROBIN MOYER, PETER MOYER, EMILY MOYER, DOUG HANSON, ANNA MARIE HANSON, BARBARA SELLAS, DEBORAH D. WARD, PAUL PERRY, PAM ROMSA, LOU BREITENBACH, KEN JERN and SHERRIE JERN v. TETON COUNTY HOUSING AUTHORITY and ERVING W. MANTEY and CARYL S. MANTEY

Case Heading (S-10-0018)
Case Number:S-10-0018Case Docketed On:01/15/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - City, County, State and Local Powers (Title 16)
Short Title:DON GRONBERG, SUE GRONBERG, JIM FARMER, WES FOX, RENELDA FOX, CHRISTY FOX, JENNY FOX, DENNIS CICHELLI, SUE CICHELLI, DEBORAH FOX, DON LANDIS, BEVERLY LANDIS, SCOTT AUSTIN, HOLLY AUSTIN, ROBIN MOYER, PETER MOYER, EMILY MOYER, DOUG HANSON, ANNA MARIE HANSON, BARBARA SELLAS, DEBORAH D. WARD, PAUL PERRY, PAM ROMSA, LOU BREITENBACH, KEN JERN and SHERRIE JERN v. TETON COUNTY HOUSING AUTHORITY and ERVING W. MANTEY and CARYL S. MANTEY
Full Title:DON GRONBERG, SUE GRONBERG, JIM FARMER, WES FOX, RENELDA FOX, CHRISTY FOX, JENNY FOX, DENNIS CICHELLI, SUE CICHELLI, DEBORAH FOX, DON LANDIS, BEVERLY LANDIS, SCOTT AUSTIN, HOLLY AUSTIN, ROBIN MOYER, PETER MOYER, EMILY MOYER, DOUG HANSON, ANNA MARIE HANSON, BARBARA SELLAS, DEBORAH D. WARD, PAUL PERRY, PAM ROMSA, LOU BREITENBACH, KEN JERN and SHERRIE JERN, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. TETON COUNTY HOUSING AUTHORITY and ERVING W. MANTEY and CARYL S. MANTEY, Appellees (Defendants)

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDon GronbergPeter F. Moyer
AppellantSue GronbergPeter F. Moyer
AppellantJim FarmerPeter F. Moyer
AppellantWes FoxPeter F. Moyer
AppellantRenelda FoxPeter F. Moyer
AppellantChristy FoxPeter F. Moyer
AppellantJenny FoxPeter F. Moyer
AppellantDennis CichelliPeter F. Moyer
AppellantSue CichelliPeter F. Moyer
AppellantDeborah FoxPeter F. Moyer
AppellantDon LandisPeter F. Moyer
AppellantBeverly LandisPeter F. Moyer
AppellantScott AustinPeter F. Moyer
AppellantRobin MoyerPeter F. Moyer
AppellantPeter F. Moyer Pro Se
AppellantEmily MoyerPeter F. Moyer
AppellantDoug HansonPeter F. Moyer
AppellantAnna Marie HansonPeter F. Moyer
AppellantBarbara SellasPeter F. Moyer
AppellantDeborah D. WardPeter F. Moyer
AppellantPaul PerryPeter F. Moyer
AppellantPam RomsaPeter F. Moyer
AppellantLou BreitenbachPeter F. Moyer
AppellantKen JernPeter F. Moyer
AppellantSherrie JernPeter F. Moyer
AppelleeTeton County Housing AuthorityJames L. Radda
AppelleeErving W. ManteyAndrea L. Richard
AppelleeCaryl S. ManteyAndrea L. Richard

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Taxation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 13
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/15/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/15/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/26/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants and received copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/15/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/16/2010Event - Rejected Filing. Rejected "Notice Incoming - Consent and Approval." Not the document submitted. Requested resubmittal as "Brief-Joinder".EventRejected FilingFinal
04/16/2010Brief - Joinder (considered timely filed)BriefJoinderFinal
04/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - copies of rejected e-filing.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Joinder by Erving W. Mantey and Caryl S. Mantey. (Document differs in text from rejected pleading, changes made after due date)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
04/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of the Appellee Teton County Housing Authority and cdEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/23/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/03/2010Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice GoldenNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
05/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/04/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Peter F. Moyer for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James Radda for appellee Teton County Housing Authority.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/17/2010Order - Assignment of judge - District Judge Keith G. Kautz is assigned to act in this matter for Justice Golden.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
06/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Andrea Richard for Appellees Mantey.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Errata - to brief of appellee Teton County Housing Authority.Notice-IncomingErrataFinal
06/11/2010Event - Phone Call re party left out caption. Party inadvertently left out at docketing, caption amended. (Party included in brief caption).EventPhone CallFinal
06/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Errata Sheet to Brief of the Appellee Teton County Housing AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/17/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Hill, Kite and Burke and Kautz, DJ (Peter F. Moyer for appellants; James L. Radda and Andrea L. Richard for Appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/17/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/01/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, District Judge Kautz writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/17/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/17/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/24/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/22/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal