judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

JEFFERSON CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC., TEXACO, INC. AND AUTOMATIC SWITCH COMPANY v. FORNEY ENGINEERING COMPANY

Case: B-2796
B-2796
06/11/1971
Application for Writ of Error
JEFFERSON CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC., TEXACO, INC. AND AUTOMATIC SWITCH COMPANY
FORNEY ENGINEERING COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/11/1971Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/25/1971Response to PetitionPetitioner
06/16/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
06/11/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
06/11/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
06/11/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/15/1971Response to Motion filed
11/11/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/25/1971Response to Petition
06/16/1971Response to Petition
06/11/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/11/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/11/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/11/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texaco, Inc. and Automatic Switch CompanyPetitioner
Jefferson Chemical Company, Inc.Petitioner
Forney Engineering CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information