judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DONALD J. BOUCHER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0029)
Case Number:S-10-0029Case Docketed On:02/04/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DONALD J. BOUCHER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DONALD J. BOUCHER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDonald J. BoucherDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Criminal Law -Speedy Trial, Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 2
Citation:245 P.3d 342

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/04/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/19/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/19/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - Motion for Removal of Exhibits filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/23/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/07/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's second motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/07/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/17/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/28/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/19/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/30/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, ten total volumes. District Court Docket 29-853, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts. District Court Docket 30-066, eight volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Jury Instructions & Verdict; Volumes IV-V, Transcripts; Volume VI, Exhibits; Volume VII, Sealed Envelope; Volume VIII, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/30/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/05/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Jenny L. Craig to appear on behalf of AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/21/2010Event - Oral argument presented. argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Jenny L. Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/21/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/18/2010Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
10/18/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of additional authorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/20/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/20/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/24/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/21/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal