judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: GARY RUSSELL, APLT

Case Information: 11-FM-0359
Short Caption:IN RE: GARY RUSSELL, APLTClassification:Appeals - Family - Other Family
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CPO3538-10Filed Date:03/15/2011

Opening Event Date:03/15/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/02/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGary Russell, Jr.N
Marlon C. GriffithNY
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/15/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/29/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on March 15, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
05/05/2011ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
05/05/2011DISMISSED
06/02/2011MANDATE ISSUED