Case Heading (S-10-0028) | |||||
Case Number: | S-10-0028 | Case Docketed On: | 02/03/2010 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Ninth Judicial District Teton County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract | ||
Short Title: | SCOTT AND RHONDA TERRIS, Husband and Wife v. EDWARD KIMMEL and EDWAL ENTERPRISES, INC. | ||||
Full Title: | SCOTT AND RHONDA TERRIS, Husband and Wife, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. EDWARD KIMMEL and EDWAL ENTERPRISES, INC., Appellees (Defendants). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Scott Terris | Thomas Stine Peters Katherine Drewry Peters |
Appellant | Rhonda Terris | Thomas Stine Peters Katherine Drewry Peters |
Appellee | Edward Kimmel | Peter F. Moyer |
Appellee | Edwal Enterprises, Inc. | Peter F. Moyer |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Contracts |
Opinion Number: | 2010 WY 110 |
Citation: | 236 P.3d 1022 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
02/03/2010 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
02/03/2010 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
02/03/2010 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
02/03/2010 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
03/15/2010 | Brief - Appellants' | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
03/17/2010 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/20/2010 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
04/21/2010 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellees; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/23/2010 | Notice-Incoming - Amended index | Notice-Incoming | Amended index | Final | |
04/26/2010 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
05/10/2010 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
05/11/2010 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
05/11/2010 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
05/14/2010 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Reply Brief and Designation of Record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
05/20/2010 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
05/20/2010 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Exhibits. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
05/25/2010 | Event - Expedited Assignment | Event | Brief Only Assignment | Final | |
08/05/2010 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
08/23/2010 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
08/23/2010 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
08/23/2010 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
08/26/2010 | Service - Certified mail signature return card | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |