judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ARNIDA B. LAMONT V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 11-CT-0358
Short Caption:ARNIDA B. LAMONT V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - DC Non-Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CDC11913-08Filed Date:03/17/2011

Opening Event Date:03/17/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/01/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/04/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantArnida B. Lamont N
Daniel K. DorseyYN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Rosalyn Calbert GroceNY
John J. WoykovskyNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/17/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
03/29/2011ORDERED: That appellant shall, within 10 calendar days from the date of this order file a motion and fully completed financial information statement to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis pursuant to D.C. App. R. 24 (3). Failure to comply with this order may result in appellant being deemed as porceeding on appeal pro se. (By: JAC)
04/22/2011 ORDERED, ss, that appellant shall proceed on appeal pro se. It is F/O that appellant shall w/n 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is F/O that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal w/out further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (ETW)
04/28/2011APPEARANCE -of Daniel Dorsey on behalf of aplt
04/28/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
06/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (16pgs/Tape) 2/18/11 proc. w/CD
06/01/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/07/2011RECORD INDEX
06/07/2011RECORD COPIES
06/07/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (Restitution information filed 6/4/10)
06/09/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
07/18/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File 40 days after receipt of transcirpts. Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/03/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief (for RT reasons)
08/22/2011FiledNotice Received aplt re: transcript (Appellant)
08/29/2011FiledStatement Regarding Transcript(s) (Appellant)
09/14/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #3 (11pgs/Tape) 2/4/10 proc. w/CD (incomplete)de
09/26/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
09/26/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
10/31/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
11/17/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until January 30, 2012
01/27/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until completion of record (Titled as: Motion to stay pending completion of record) (Appellee)Granted
03/01/2012FiledSupplemental Record - #4 (28pgs/McCarn) 2/4/10 proc. w/CD
03/06/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE//MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING
09/12/2012FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTINO and the CLERK SHALL FILE THE LODGED MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE and the MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED
09/12/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellant)Granted
09/12/2012FiledAffirmed
10/04/2012FiledMandate