judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STARWOOD (HRW) TIMESHARE VS. DESERT INN HOMEOWNERS (NRAP 5)

Case Information: 36466
Short Caption:STARWOOD (HRW) TIMESHARE VS. DESERT INN HOMEOWNERS (NRAP 5)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - NRAP 5 - U.S. District Court
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/21/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/21/2000Order/IncomingFiled Order Certifying Question to Nevada Supreme Court. Received from U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada. 00-12628
07/27/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100.00 from Hale Lane Peek Dennison Howard & Anderson--check no. 033245. Additional $100 due from respondents.
07/27/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney W. West Allen requesting clarification of briefing schedule. 00-13057
08/03/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100.00 from Deaner, Deaner, Scann, Malan & Larsen--check no. 29989.
09/11/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve an opening brief and appendix in compliance with the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). fn1[We grant appellants' request for clarification of the briefing schedule and direct the clerk of this court to file the request received on July 27, 2000.] 00-15946
09/11/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney W. West Allen requesting clarification of briefing schedule. 00-13057
10/04/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 11, 2000. 00-17587
11/14/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice Regarding Status of Certified Matter and of Appellants' Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(I). 00-19921
01/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Suspending Briefing and Requiring Status Report. Appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a status report on the federal action. The briefing schedule shall be suspended pending further order of this court. 01-01435
02/21/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Appellant's Status Report. 01-03238
03/09/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Appellants' Supplemental Status Report. 01-04297
03/14/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Dismissing Certified Question. Appellants timely filed a status report and a supplemental status report. In their reports, appellants indicate that they filed a motion in federal court seeking a dismissal of the action and requested the federal court to issue an order withdrawing the question certified to this court. The federal court's order dismisses the federal action and withdraws its certifiction of the question to this court. We thus conclude that " . . . this matter is now moot and should be dismissed." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-04551
04/10/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-04573
04/10/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/08/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by United States District Court Clerk on February 28, 2002. 01-04573