judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROSAS (RAYMOND) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36447
Short Caption:ROSAS (RAYMOND) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR991843BClassification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/18/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/18/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-12363
07/26/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-12985
07/26/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: Arpil 17, 18, & 19, 2000. To Court Reporter: Julie Kernan. 00-12987
08/25/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 17, 2000; April 18, 2000; and April 19, 2000. Court Reporter: Julie Ann Kernan. 00-14986
11/17/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: December 18, 2000. 00-20200
12/21/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-22235
12/26/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The appellant's opening brief and apepndix shall be served and filed on or before January 17, 2001. 00-22377
01/18/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Third Request) 01-01189
01/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant appellant's motion to and including February 16, 2001, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions shall be permitted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 01-01436
02/23/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Fourth Request). 01-03438
03/02/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and joint appendix received on February 26, 2001. 01-03891
03/02/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 02/23/01. 01-03520
03/02/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-03521
03/27/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 03/26/01. 01-05357
04/05/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Election Not to File a Reply Brief. 01-05892
04/05/2001Case Status Update Briefing Completed.
05/29/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We have determined that oral argument is not warranted in this appeal. 'ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED.' SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-08847
06/26/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08982
06/26/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/05/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 27, 2001. 01-08982