judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD DEAN YOUNGBERG v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0202)
Case Number:S-11-0202Case Docketed On:09/02/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:RICHARD DEAN YOUNGBERG v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RICHARD DEAN YOUNGBERG, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRICHARD DEAN YOUNGBERGDiane M. Lozano
Elisabeth M.W. Trefonas
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
Stewart Michael Young
Joshua Beau Taylor
David L. Delicath
Kyle A. Ridgeway

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct
Opinion Number:2012 WY 119
Citation:284 P.3d 820

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/02/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/02/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/09/2011Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
10/17/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/18/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/18/2011Order - Grant - extension of time to file Appellant's BriefOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/22/2011Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Elisabeth Trefonas for appellant.Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
11/23/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of appearance - Elisabeth M. Trefonas for appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/28/2011Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Second Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/29/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/05/2011Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - Tina Olson.MotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
12/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Withdraw Tina N. OlsonEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2011Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel Tina N. OlsonOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
12/07/2011Event - Phone Call to Public Defender re appearance by Kirk Morgan, will file motion to withdraw.EventPhone CallFinal
01/19/2012Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/20/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/27/2012Notice-Incoming - Designation of record on appealNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
03/06/2012Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
03/06/2012Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/06/2012Event - Phone Call - Called the public defenders office re counsel. Diane Lozano and Elisabeth Trefonas are counsel on this case.EventPhone CallFinal
03/07/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; Received copy of Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/09/2012Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/09/2012Notice-Internal - VetoNotice-InternalVetoFinal
03/27/2012Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/30/2012Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/30/2012Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Exhibits; and Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/30/2012Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/10/2012Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/20/2012Motion - Oral argument - vacate (pleading dated 4/19/2012, but was e-filed on 4/20/2012)MotionOral argument - vacateFinal
04/20/2012Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for order vacating and resetting oral argument; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/23/2012Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Elisabeth M.W. Trefonos obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/24/2012Order - Vacating oral argument and assigning to expedited docketOrderVacating oral argument and assigning to brief only docketFinal
09/10/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/26/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/26/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/26/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/26/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/28/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 9/27/12ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal