judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEYUON M. HAMILTON V. HOJEIJ BRANDED FOOD, INC.

Case Information: 11-AA-0332
Short Caption:KEYUON M. HAMILTON V. HOJEIJ BRANDED FOOD, INC.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES46-11Filed Date:03/15/2011

Opening Event Date:03/15/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/08/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/27/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/04/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerKeyuon M. Hamilton N
Jeffrey S. GutmanYY
RespondentHojeij Branded Food Inc.N
Karl M. Terrell YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
03/15/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
03/15/2011FILING FEE 0F $100.00 PAID
03/16/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAG, OAH, & respondent
03/23/2011 On consideration of the petition for review in this matter, and it appearing that Hojeij Branded Food, Inc. is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (A)(5). It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
04/25/2011RECEIVED - entry of appearance of Karl M. Terrell representing the respondent
05/04/2011MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE Karl Terrell Granted
05/12/2011ORDER GRANT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE and the motion of Karl M. Terrell, Esq., is granted and the Clerk shall enter the appearance of Karl M. Terrell, Esq., pro hac vice on behalf of Hojeij Branded Food, Inc. (ETW)
05/16/2011error
07/26/2011LodgedReceived - Courtesy copy of ltr sent to the petitioner from OAH regarding preparation and cost of transcripts (OAH)
09/08/2011FiledRecord On Appeal w/2/15/11 hearing
09/08/2011FiledRecord Completed
09/19/2011FiledBriefing Order
10/27/2011FiledBrief (Petitioner)
10/27/2011FiledAppendix (Petitioner)
12/01/2011FiledBrief (Respondent)
12/01/2011FiledBriefing Completed
12/14/2011FiledReply Brief (Petitioner)
01/12/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/27/2012FiledSubmitted To Glickman,Thompson,Schwelb
04/12/2012FiledReversed And Remanded (OPINION) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the decision of the OAH is reversed, and this case is remanded with directions to grant Ms. Hamilton's application for unemployment compensation benefits.)
05/04/2012FiledMandate