judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BUD COREY MORRISON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0203)
Case Number:S-11-0203Case Docketed On:09/06/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Weston CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:BUD COREY MORRISON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BUD COREY MORRISON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBud Corey MorrisonDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingGregory A. Phillips
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath
Paul S. Rehurek

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing -Credit for Time Served
Opinion Number:2012 WY 41
Citation:272 P.3d 321

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/06/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/18/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/18/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/09/2011Notice-Incoming - Amended index and various pleadings.Notice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
11/30/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/01/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/05/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
12/20/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/27/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/27/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/27/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/20/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/05/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/05/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/05/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/09/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/6/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal