judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEWIS (TROY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36448
Short Caption:LEWIS (TROY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 31888
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR970545Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/22/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/18/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/18/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-12368
08/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36402, 36403, 36404, 36405, 36448. Document No. 00-13619
08/22/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3. 00-14739
08/22/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/21/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On March 5, 2001, this cout received a notice of withdrawal of appeal signed by appellant. We elect to construe this notice as a motion to voluntarily withdraw the appeal pursuant to NRAP 42(b). The motion is granted, and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-04950
03/21/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.