judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ROGER M. OLSEN v. HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case: B-2800
B-2800
06/14/1971
Application for Writ of Error
ROGER M. OLSEN
HARTFORD ACCIDENT AND INDEMNITY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/15/1972Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/22/1971Response to Brief filedPetitioner
11/12/1971Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
06/24/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
06/14/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/20/1972Response to Motion filed
03/15/1972Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/01/1972Dissenting opinion issued.
03/01/1972Opinion issued
11/22/1971Response to Brief filed
11/12/1971Supplemental Brief filed
10/06/1971Document received (See Remarks)
10/06/1971Document received (See Remarks)
10/06/1971Document received (See Remarks)
06/24/1971Response to Petition
06/14/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/14/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Roger M. OlsenPetitioner
Hartford Accident and Indemnity CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information